VA HB1440 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Farm use vehicles; penalties. Imposes a $250 fine for willfully and intentionally violating the limitations for the use of farm use vehicles on a highway for a second or subsequent violation. Current law allows for a fine of up to $250 regardless of the number of previous violations.
Title
Farm use vehicles; imposes $250 fine for violating limitations while operating unregistered vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 204 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1440ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (10-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 44-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1440H2 |
2017-01-27 | House | Substitute by Delegate Richard P. Bell agreed to 17104849D-H2 |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | House | Floor substitute printed 17104849D-H2 (Bell, Richard P.) |
2017-01-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-23 | House | Floor substitute printed 17104534D-H1 (Bell, Richard P.) |
2017-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 9-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-11-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-11-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100180D |
Subjects
Agriculture Animal Care and Food
Farmers Farm Produce and Equipment
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Motor Vehicles
Farmers Farm Produce and Equipment
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Motor Vehicles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 665 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 666 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 670 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |