VA HB144 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Charitable gaming; definition of organization. Adds to the list of organizations permitted to conduct charitable gaming organizations that are exempt from income tax pursuant to ยง 501(c)(7) of the Internal Revenue Code and are operated, and have always been operated, exclusively to provide scholarships to local schools and other community assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable gaming; clarifies definition of organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-10 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10HouseStricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2022-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2022-01-26HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2022-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103188D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182340.16(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.23(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.26:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback