VA HB1439 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Board of Social Services; regulations related to staffing of assisted living facilities providing care for adults with serious cognitive impairments. Directs the State Board of Social Services to amend regulations governing staffing of assisted living facilities that provide care for adults with serious cognitive impairments who cannot recognize danger or protect their own safety and welfare to allow an exception to certain requirements for assisted living facilities that are licensed for 10 or fewer residents if no more than three of the residents have serious cognitive impairments. The bill also directs the Board of Social Services to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill within 280 days and prohibits the Board of Social Services from enforcing the provisions of 22VAC40-73-1020, as it shall become effective, in cases involving assisted living facilities that are licensed for 10 or fewer residents if no more than three of the residents have serious cognitive impairments. The bill contains an emergency clause and is identical to SB 875.
Title
Assisted living facilities; regulations governing staff.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] |
Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 248 (effective 3/9/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1439ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 18104728D-E |
2018-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1439E |
2018-02-06 | House | Emergency clause added |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104728D |