VA HB1437 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile confinement for violation of court order. Reduces from 10 days to seven days the maximum allowable period of confinement of a juvenile in a secure facility for a contempt violation or when a child in need of supervision is found to have willfully and materially violated an order of the court. The bill also provides that any order of disposition of such violation confining the juvenile in a secure facility for juveniles shall (i) identify the valid court order that has been violated; (ii) specify the factual basis for determining that there is reasonable cause to believe that the juvenile has violated such order; (iii) state the findings of fact that support a determination that there is no appropriate less restrictive alternative available to placing the juvenile in such a facility, with due consideration to the best interest of the juvenile; (iv) specify the length of time of such confinement, not to exceed seven days; and (v) include a plan for the juvenile's release from such facility.
Title
Juveniles; confinement for violation of court order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 593 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1437ER) |
2020-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105120D |