VA HB1436 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-10)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; military benefits subtraction; age restriction. Removes the age 55 or older restriction on those individuals allowed a military benefits income tax subtraction beginning with taxable year 2023.
Title
Income tax, state; military benefits subtraction, age restriction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102662D |