VA HB1434 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Competency and sanity evaluations; audiovisual recording. Provides that any evaluator evaluating a defendant's competency to stand trial or sanity shall, if practicable, make an audiovisual recording of any interview conducted with the defendant. The bill provides that the failure to make such a recording does not affect the admissibility of the evaluator's evidence, but the court may consider such failure in determining the weight given to such evidence.
Title
Competency and sanity evaluations; audiovisual recording.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-12-24 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-12-24 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100477D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 169.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 169.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1434 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1434+hil |