VA HB1433 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure of professional counselors; Counseling Compact. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the Counseling Compact. The Compact permits eligible licensed professional counselors to practice in Compact member states, provided that they are licensed in at least one member state. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024, and directs the Board of Counseling to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Counseling Compact; licensure of professional counselors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 684 (effective 1/1/24) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1433ER) |
2023-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100783D |
Same As/Similar To
SB802 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
SB802 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
SB802 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)