VA HB1431 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Contributory negligence bar; abolished. Provides that the negligence of a plaintiff shall not automatically bar plaintiff's recovery in any action for injury, wrongful death, or property damage unless the plaintiff's negligence is (i) a proximate cause of the plaintiff's injury and (ii) greater than the aggregated total amount of negligence of all the defendants that proximately caused the plaintiff's injury. The bill further provides that any damages recoverable by the plaintiff shall be diminished by an amount that is proportionately equal to the percentage of negligent conduct of the plaintiff.
Title
Contributory negligence bar; abolished.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100146D |