VA HB1429 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Social Services; collection of data regarding substance abuse that results in removal of child from home. Provides that whenever the primary reason for removing a child from his home by a local board of social services is categorized as substance abuse by his parent or guardian, including removal due to in utero drug exposure, the Department of Social Services shall, to the extent possible, collect and record information regarding the specific drugs taken by the parent or guardian. The bill requires the Department to develop a process and system to collect, collate, and report such data by July 1, 2019, and to implement such process and system by July 1, 2020.
Title
Social Services, Department of; collection of data regarding substance abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104207D |