VA HB1426 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0094)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0094)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency custody or involuntary admission process; alternative transportation model. Directs the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and the Director of Criminal Justice Services, in conjunction with the relevant stakeholders, to develop a comprehensive model for the use of alternative transportation providers to provide safe and efficient transportation of individuals involved in the emergency custody or involuntary admission process as an alternative to transportation by law enforcement. The bill requires that the model be completed by October 1, 2017, and reported to the Joint Subcommittee to Study Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the 21st Century, the House Committee for Courts of Justice, and the Senate Committee for Courts of Justice. This bill is identical to SB 1221.
Title
Emergency custody or involuntary admission process; alternative transportation model.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0--N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0094) | |
2017-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 94 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1426ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0--N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 17100871D-E |
2017-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1426E |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2016-11-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-11-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100871D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Criminal Justice Services
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Criminal Justice Services
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation