VA HB1425 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Conservators of the peace; search warrants; military criminal investigative organizations. Provides that a special agent of the United States Army Criminal Investigation Division and United States Air Force Office of Special Investigations shall be a conservator of the peace and may serve a search warrant jointly with a Virginia law-enforcement officer. Under current law, of the federal military investigation offices, only a special agent of the United States Naval Criminal Investigative Service has this authority. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conservators of the peace; search warrants, military criminal investigative organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107)
2023-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 107 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023
2023-02-16SenateSigned by President
2023-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1425ER)
2023-02-15HouseEnrolled
2023-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13SenateRead third time
2023-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-08SenateReported from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N)
2023-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2023-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-27HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-25HouseRead first time
2023-01-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
2023-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2023-01-19HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2022-12-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2022-12-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102286D

Same As/Similar To

SB801 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0108)
SB801 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0108)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19212(n/a)See Bill Text
19256(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback