VA HB1425 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; tuition waiver for dependent children of faculty. Authorizes public institutions of higher education to grant full or partial tuition waivers to dependent students of faculty members employed by the institution, to be paid out of the institution's nongeneral funds and used for undergraduate education. The bill would also authorize such institutions to enter into reciprocal agreements that would allow the dependents of faculty to use waivers at other public institutions of higher education that are party to the agreement.
Title
Higher education; tuition waiver for dependent children of faculty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104950D |