VA HB1423 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Medical Assistance Services; publication of information related to home care services. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to annually publish on its website the average hourly payment rates for home care services for each type of service provided. The bill also requires the Department to publish the total number of Medicaid-paid home care claims and the number of Medicaid enrollees who received home care services in the prior year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home care services; publication of information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
2024-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 484 (effective 7/1/24)
2024-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024
2024-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024
2024-03-03SenateSigned by President
2024-02-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2024-02-29HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1423ER)
2024-02-29HouseEnrolled
2024-02-26SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2024-02-26SenateRead third time
2024-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2024-02-22SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2024-02-19SenateAssigned Education and Health Sub: Health
2024-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2024-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2024-02-12HouseVOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N)
2024-02-12HouseRead third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N)
2024-02-09HouseRead second time and engrossed
2024-02-08HouseRead first time
2024-02-06HouseReported from Health and Human Services (16-Y 6-N)
2024-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2024-01-23HouseAssigned sub: Social Services
2024-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2024-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 24103359D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB1423
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1423+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1423ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+CHAP0484+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1423F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1423FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H2404V0020+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H2404V0031+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H24V0119+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV0571+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S04V0222+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0603HB1423+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0619HB1423+HB1423

Bill Comments

feedback