VA HB1423 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School Readiness Committee; renaming as Commission on Early Childhood Care and Education; purpose; membership; powers and duties. Renames the School Readiness Committee as the Commission on Early Childhood Care and Education and makes several changes to the Commission, including adjusting its purpose, increasing and adjusting its membership, and establishing eight enumerated powers and duties for the Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Readiness Committee; renaming as Commission on Early Childhood Care and Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
2023-03-16 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-21SenateSigned by President
2023-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1423ER)
2023-02-20HouseEnrolled
2023-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14SenateRead third time
2023-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-10SenateReported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
2023-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-27HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26HousePrinted as engrossed 23101483D-E
2023-01-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1423E
2023-01-26HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2023-01-26HouseRead second time
2023-01-25HouseRead first time
2023-01-23HouseReported from Education with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
2023-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-17HouseAssigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation
2022-12-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2022-12-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101483D

Same As/Similar To

SB1404 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
SB1404 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22208.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1423
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1423+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1423E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1423ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0008+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23104775A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB1423AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1423F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1423FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1423FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0903V0015+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H09V0016+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1115+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S10V0063+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0439HB1423+HB1423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0445HB1423+HB1423

Bill Comments

feedback