VA HB142 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of police and court records; pardons. Provides that any person granted an absolute pardon is, upon petition, entitled to the expungement of the police and court records relating to the conviction. Currently, only a person granted an absolute pardon for a crime he did not commit is so entitled.
Title
Police and court records; expungement of records, pardons.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101350D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |