VA HB1419 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School resource officers and school security officers; training standards. Requires school resource officers and school security officers to receive training specific to the role and responsibility of a law-enforcement officer working with students in a school environment that includes training on (i) relevant state and federal laws; (ii) school and personal liability issues; (iii) security awareness in the school environment; (iv) mediation and conflict resolution, including de-escalation techniques such as physical alternatives to restraint; (v) disaster and emergency response; (vi) awareness of cultural diversity and implicit bias; (vii) working with students with disabilities, mental health needs, substance abuse disorders, or past traumatic experiences; and (viii) student behavioral dynamics, including current child and adolescent development and brain research.
Title
School resource officers and school security officers; training standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 638 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1419ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102267D |
Same As/Similar To
SB171 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)