VA HB1419 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; instructional time. Requires local school boards to provide (i) a minimum of 680 hours of instructional time to students in elementary school, except for students in half-day kindergarten, in the four academic disciplines of English, mathematics, science, and history and social science and (ii) a minimum of 375 hours of instructional time to students in half-day kindergarten in the four academic disciplines of English, mathematics, science, and history and social science. The bill authorizes local school boards to include and requires the Board of Education to accept, for elementary school, unstructured recreational time that is intended to develop teamwork, social skills, and overall physical fitness in any calculation of total instructional time or teaching hours. This bill is identical to SB 273.
Title
Public schools; instructional time for elementary school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785) | |
2018-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 785 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1419ER) |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N) |
2018-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senators: Carrico, Suetterlein, Lewis |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | Delegates: Delaney, Davis, Yancey |
2018-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-05 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 18107571D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1419S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107571D-S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107571D-S1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18106624D-EH1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1419EH1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendment by Delegate Davis agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106624D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106624D-H1 |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104770D |