VA HB1418 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Control of firearms; libraries owned or operated by localities. Allows a locality to adopt an ordinance that prohibits firearms, ammunition, or components or a combination thereof in libraries owned or operated by the locality.
Title
Firearms; libraries owned or operated by localities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2016-10-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-10-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100870D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1418 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1418+hil |