VA HB1416 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Line of Duty Act; payments to beneficiaries. Increases from $100,000 to $125,000 the sum payable out of the general fund to the beneficiary of a deceased law-enforcement officer or other person covered by the Line of Duty Act whose death occurred on or after January 1, 2006, while in the line of duty as the direct or proximate result of the performance of his duty.
Title
Line of Duty Act; payments to beneficiaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2016-10-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-10-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100562D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1416 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1416+hil |