VA HB1413 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expiration and renewal of driver's licenses. Requires that the Department of Motor Vehicles treat a driver's license that has been expired for 30 days or less on the date of renewal the same as an unexpired license for purposes of renewal.
Title
Driver's licenses; expiration and renewal.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. James Edmunds [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] |
Del. Chris Jones [R] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Michael Webert [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2017-01-16 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-10-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-10-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100350D |