VA HB1411 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reckless handling of firearms; revocation of hunting license. Provides that a person's hunting or trapping license, or privilege to hunt or trap while possessing a firearm, may be revoked for a period of one to five years for a violation of §18.2-56.1 (reckless handling of firearms) while hunting. Revocation for a person whose privilege to hunt has been revoked who hunts with a firearm will be for a period of one year to life. Currently, the penalties are revocation for a period of one year to life and for hunting with a firearm while the privilege is revoked, an additional period of one to five years.
Title
Reckless handling of firearms; revocation of hunting license.
Sponsors
Del. William Janis [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 684 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1411ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 11100311D-E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1411E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2010-09-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-09-15 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100311D |