VA HB1410 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (7-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (7-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Governing boards of public institutions of higher education; duties. Requires the board of visitors of each baccalaureate public institution of higher education, except Virginia Military Institute, Norfolk State University, and Virginia State University, to adopt policies prohibiting the annual enrollment of full-time equivalent undergraduate non-Virginia students from exceeding 30 percent of the total annual enrollment of full-time equivalent undergraduate students unless the board, after covering the cost to educate each full-time equivalent undergraduate non-Virginia student that exceeds such 30 percent cap with tuition revenue from such students, uses any remaining tuition revenue from such students to lower in equal amounts the rate of tuition and fees charged to each undergraduate Virginia student. The bill declares that the governing board of each public institution of higher education has a duty to the Commonwealth and its citizens.
Title
Higher educational institutions, baccalaureate public; enrollment of non-Virginia students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (7-Y 8-N) (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (7-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1410H2 |
2017-02-06 | House | Appropriations Committee substitute agreed to 17105197D-H2 |
2017-02-06 | House | Appropriations Committee substitute rejected 17104912D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-06 | House | Incorporates HB1886 (Hugo) |
2017-02-06 | House | Incorporates HB1887 (Hugo) |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105197D-H2 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104912D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-10-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-10-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100269D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1153 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2016.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2263 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2817.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 290.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 346 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 346.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1304.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2640 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 611.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 615 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127.1:05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 126.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |