VA HB1407 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0681)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0681)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Misclassification of employees as independent contractors; Department of Taxation to investigate and enforce; civil penalties. Prohibits an employer from classifying an individual as an independent contractor if he is an employee. An individual shall be considered an employee of the party that pays the remuneration for purposes of Titles 40.1 (Labor and Employment), 58.1 (Taxation), 60.2 (Unemployment Compensation), and 65.2 (Workers' Compensation) unless it is demonstrated that such individual is an independent contractor. The Department of Taxation shall determine whether an individual is an independent contractor by applying Internal Revenue Service guidelines. Violators are subject to civil penalties and debarment from public contracts. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.
Title
Misclassification of employees as independent contractors; Dept. of Taxation to investigate, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0681) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 681 (effective 1/1/21) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1407ER) |
2020-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (56-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (11-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 20105144D-E |
2020-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1407E |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105144D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1821 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1825 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |