VA HB1406 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Restoration of right to possess, etc., a firearm. Provides that a person convicted of a felony, other than a violent felony, whose civil rights have been restored is not required to petition a circuit court for an order to possess, transport, or carry a firearm, ammunition for a firearm, or a stun weapon. The bill provides that such person's right to possess, transport, or carry such items is automatically restored upon the restoration of his civil rights. The bill has an effective date of January 1, 2019, contingent upon voter approval of amendments to Article II, Section 1 and Article V, Section 12 of the Constitution of Virginia at the November 2018 general election.
Title
Firearms; restoration of right to person convicted of a nonviolent felony to possess, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-09-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-09-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100358D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1406 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1406+hil |