VA HB1405 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

State Board of Elections; membership; appointment of Commissioner of Elections. Increases the membership of the State Board of Elections (Board) from three members to six members and increases the terms of Board members from four years to six years. Equal representation shall be given to each of the political parties having the highest and next highest number of votes in the Commonwealth at the last preceding gubernatorial election. Appointments are to be made with due consideration of geographical representation and no two Board members are to reside in the same congressional district. Terms are initially staggered. The bill also grants to the Board the authority to appoint and remove the Commissioner of Elections, subject to confirmation by the General Assembly, to head the Department of Elections and to act as the principal administrative officer. The appointment or removal of the Commissioner shall require an affirmative vote of five of the six Board members. The bill requires the Board to submit an annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, State Board of; increases membership and terms appointment of Commissioner of Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N) (Y: 1 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseFailed to pass
2018-03-10HouseNo further action taken
2018-03-10SenateSenators: Cosgrove, Edwards, Chafin
2018-03-10SenateConferees reappointed by Senate
2018-03-08SenateSenators: Edwards, Obenshain, Cosgrove
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Ransone, Cole, Lindsey
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107265D-S1 (1-Y 94-N)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1405S1
2018-03-05SenateSubstitute by Senator Edwards ruled out of order 18107587D-S2
2018-03-05SenateFloor substitute printed to LIS only 18107587D-S2 (Edwards)
2018-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107265D-S1
2018-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-01SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-27SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-26SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-23SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107265D-S1
2018-02-20SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 2-N)
2018-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N)
2018-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 47-N)
2018-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1405H1
2018-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105959D-H1
2018-01-31HouseRead second time
2018-01-30HouseRead first time
2018-01-26HouseSubstitute bill reprinted 18105959D-H1
2018-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105959D-H1
2018-01-26HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 10-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 18103919D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22106(n/a)See Bill Text
242102(n/a)See Bill Text
242103(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1405
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1405+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1405H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1405S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1405S2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1802V0002+HB1405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H18V0006+HB1405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0221+HB1405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0111+HB1405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0639HB1405+HB1405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0888HB1405+HB1405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1379+HB1405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1015HB1405+HB1405

Bill Comments

feedback