VA HB1404 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Canadian Prescription Drug Importation Program established. Canadian Prescription Drug Importation Program established. Establishes the Canadian Prescription Drug Importation Program, pending federal approval and certification from the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Under the Program, the Commissioner of Health is required to designate the Department of Health, the Commissioner, or another agency or officer of the Commonwealth; a licensed drug wholesaler; or a nonprofit, nonstock corporation established by the Department as a public instrumentality exercising public and essential governmental functions to (i) import prescription drugs from Canadian suppliers and (ii) distribute the imported prescription drugs to pharmacies or pharmacists in the Commonwealth that contract with the designated entity to make the imported prescription drugs available to residents of the Commonwealth at the cost prescribed in the contract. The measure provides that only prescription drugs that have the highest potential for cost savings to the Commonwealth shall be identified for importation. The Program will authorize the designated entity to purchase prescription drugs from a Canadian supplier and distribute the prescription drugs to pharmacists and pharmacies that are in-network under a health plan provided by a health carrier, state employee health plan or local choice plan, and the Medicaid program. Contracts between the pharmacist or pharmacy and the designated entity will set the price at which the prescription drugs are to be provided to covered individuals. The measure requires the Commissioner, by December 1, 2021, to review the proposed Program and, if the proposed Program is approved, to submit the proposed Program for federal review. The Department is also required to prepare an implementation plan, which is to be put into effect six months after the last to occur of (a) the enactment of any legislation required for the establishment of the charge or assessment to finance the Program and (b) receipt of notice that the proposed Program has been approved and certified by the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Canadian Prescription Drug Importation Program; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100320D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32178.1(n/a)See Bill Text
32178.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback