VA HB1403 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain public institutions of higher education; provision of university housing at no cost to certain students during scheduled intersessions. Requires any public institution of higher education that maintains and operates university housing during scheduled intersessions to provide access to such housing at no cost to any student who is eligible for a certain tuition and fee grant based on his placement in foster care at age 18 and satisfaction of several other enumerated criteria, provided that the student (i) is a registered student for the immediately following academic term and (ii) meets the definitions and conditions of the federal McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act, as amended.
Title
Higher educational institutions, certain public; provision of university housing at no cost, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033) | |
2023-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 33 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1403ER) |
2023-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-18 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-11-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-11-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100853D |
Subjects
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Students
Uncodified Legislation
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Students
Uncodified Legislation