VA HB1401 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Administration of naloxone; correctional and probation officers. Adds correctional officers and probation officers who have completed a training program to the list of individuals who may possess and administer naloxone.
Title
Naloxone; administration by correctional and probation officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104239D |