VA HB14 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public animal shelters; dogs and cats; euthanasia notice. Requires a public animal shelter to wait three days before euthanizing a dog or cat when a person has notified the shelter of his intent to adopt or take custody of the particular animal. The shelter must make reasonable efforts to accomplish the release of the dog or cat but is not required to hold the animal if it has reason to believe that the animal has seriously injured a human or the animal meets certain other specified conditions for euthanasia.
Title
Dogs or cats; public animal shelters required to notify intent to euthanize.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-11-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100613D |