VA HB1399 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; farm wineries. Permits farm wineries to receive deliveries and shipments of wine not manufactured by the farm winery and sell and deliver or ship this wine to the Board or wholesale licensees for the purpose of resale. The bill also clarifies the definition of farm.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; farm wineries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194) | |
2008-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 194 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1399ER) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1399H1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081850716-H1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 7-N) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Committee substitute printed 081850716-H1 | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming | |
2008-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-10 | House: Presented and ordered printed 081817716 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1399 |