VA HB1398 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on August 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hate crimes; acts against law-enforcement officers, firefighters, and EMS personnel. Expands the definition of hate crime for the purpose of reporting hate crimes within the Department of State Police to include acts against persons employed as law-enforcement officers, firefighters, or emergency medical services personnel.
Title
Hate crimes; acts against law-enforcement officers, firefighters, and EMS personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-08-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-08-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100179D |
Subjects
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Emergency Services and Vehicles
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Hate Crimes
Law-Enforcement Officers
Police
Police State
Professions and Occupations
Emergency Services and Vehicles
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Hate Crimes
Law-Enforcement Officers
Police
Police State
Professions and Occupations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1398 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1398+hil |