VA HB1397 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Student immunization requirements; parental opt-out. Permits any parent of a child who attends any public or private preschool, nursery school, licensed child care center, or elementary or secondary school or who is school-aged but receives home instruction or is exempted or excused from school attendance pursuant to relevant law to elect for his child not to receive any immunization otherwise required by the State Board of Health. Under current law, such a parent is only permitted to make such an election if he (i) objects on the grounds that the administration of immunizing agents conflicts with his religious tenets or practices or (ii) presents a statement from a physician licensed to practice medicine in Virginia, a licensed nurse practitioner, or a local health department that states that the physical condition of the child is such that the administration of one or more of the required immunizing agents would be detrimental to the health of the child.
Title
Student immunization requirements; parental opt out.
Sponsors
Del. Marie March [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2023-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-11-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-11-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101005D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 271.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 271.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 46 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 46.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |