VA HB1396 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Grottoes. Authorizes the town council to appoint a member to the office of vice-mayor, to serve in the event of the mayor's absence or inability to act. This bill is identical to SB 786.
Title
Grottoes, Town of; amending charter, appointment of member to office of vice-mayor, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1396ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-07-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-07-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100172D |