VA HB1395 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abandoned vehicles; sale of those taken into custody at auction. Provides that "public auctions" at which abandoned vehicles are sold by local governments can include Internet sales. The bill also reduces the time period that a locality must hold the proceeds from such a sale for the owner from 90 to 60 days.
Title
Abandoned vehicles; public auction conducted by locality shall include an Internet sale by auction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 241 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1395ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1395H1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104437D-H1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104437D-H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #2 |
2012-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2012-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100956D |