VA HB1394 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Family life education programs; materials; summaries. Requires each local school board that offers a family life education program to post for public viewing on the local school division's official website a summary of such program. The bill also requires local school boards to share through any available parental portal a complete copy of all printed family life education program materials not subject to copyright protection and a description of all family life education program audio-visual materials. The bill requires each local school board to implement the foregoing provisions no later than the start of the 2021-2022 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family life education programs; materials, summaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator McCLellan agreed to (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 23-N) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 689 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1394ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (93-Y 1-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 1-N)
2020-02-27SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-27SenateAmendment by Senator McCLellan agreed to (21-Y 18-N)
2020-02-27SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-25SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-24SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-24SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-24SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
2020-02-11SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2020-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-30HouseVOTE: Passage (76-Y 23-N)
2020-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (76-Y 23-N)
2020-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 20106144D-EH1
2020-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1394EH1
2020-01-29HouseAmendment by Delegate Leftwich agreed to
2020-01-29HousePassed by temporarily
2020-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106144D-H1
2020-01-29HouseRead second time
2020-01-28HousePassed by for the day
2020-01-27HousePassed by for the day
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106144D-H1
2020-01-22HouseReported from Education with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104014D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221207.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1394
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1394+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1394H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1394EH1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1394ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0689+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0903V0015+HB1394
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0025+HB1394
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0225+HB1394
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0314+HB1394
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB1394+HB1394
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1167HB1394+HB1394
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1168HB1394+HB1394
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1665+HB1394

Bill Comments

feedback