VA HB1386 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disaster relief assistance by out-of-state businesses and employees. Provides that out-of-state businesses and employees who come into the Commonwealth solely for the purpose of performing disaster-related or emergency-related work in response to a declared disaster or emergency shall not be subject to state or local taxes or registration requirements. However, nothing in the bill is to be construed as to change the obligation of the business or employee to be subject to withholding or pay income taxes in the employee's home state during the disaster response period. Upon request, the State Corporation Commission may require such a business to provide certain information. The Commission is required to maintain a record of such information and to make the record available to the public. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Disaster relief; assistance by out-of-state businesses and employees.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Scott Garrett [R] | Del. Barry Knight [R] |
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 595 (effective 3/26/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1386ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 15105262D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1386S1 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Watkins agreed to |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105262D-S1 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105262D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1386H1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104057D-H1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104057D-H1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/14/15 15100580D |