VA HB1385 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0114)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0114)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Divorce; affidavit; children of the parties. Clarifies that an affidavit submitted as evidence in support of a divorce shall state whether there were minor children either born of the parties, born of either party and adopted by the other, or adopted by both parties. Current law provides that such an affidavit shall state whether there were children born or adopted of the marriage.
Title
Divorce; affidavit submitted as evidence, minor children of the parties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0114) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 114 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1385ER) |
2023-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-11-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-11-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100592D |