VA HB1384 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; licensure by apprenticeship. Requires the regulatory boards within the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation to grant a license, defined in the bill, to an applicant for licensure by apprenticeship, also defined in the bill, if the applicant has (i) completed an apprenticeship in an occupation that is regulated by the board operated within the Department, and the board grants licensure to individuals in such occupation or an occupation with a similar scope of practice; (ii) passed all requisite examinations; and (iii) paid all applicable fees, as determined by the board. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024.
Title
Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; licensure by apprenticeship.
Sponsors
Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. John Avoli [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Del. Wren Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in General Laws |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-11-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-11-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100791D |