VA HB1383 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Marriage and family therapy; appraisal. Defines "marriage and family therapy" as the "appraisal and treatment" of cognitive, affective, or behavioral mental and emotional disorders within the context of marriage and family systems through the application of therapeutic and family systems theories and techniques and delivery of services to individuals, couples, and families, singularly or in groups, for the purpose of treating such disorders. Under current law, "marriage and family therapy" is defined as the "assessment and treatment" of such disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage and family therapy; clarifies definition, adds appraisal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
2018-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 375 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1383ER)
2018-02-28HouseEnrolled
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead third time and passed House (95-Y 2-N)
2018-02-09HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-06HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 18104401D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413500(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback