VA HB1382 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Agricultural best management practices tax credit; refundability for corporations. Allows taxpayers to apply for a refund of corporate income tax credits received for expenditures for agricultural best management practices. Under current law, corporate income tax credits that exceed the taxpayer's tax liability are not refundable but may be carried forward for up to five years. Furthermore, under current law, individual income tax credits for expenditures related to agricultural best management practices are refundable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural best management practices tax credit; refundability for corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 556 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-01HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1382ER)
2018-03-01HouseEnrolled
2018-02-28SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-09HouseRead first time
2018-02-07HouseReported from Finance (21-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 18104070D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581439.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1382
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1382+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1382ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0556+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1002V0014+HB1382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0051+HB1382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0075+HB1382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0722+HB1382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0322+HB1382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB1382+HB1382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0752HB1382+HB1382

Bill Comments

feedback