VA HB1379 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; records of retail licensees. Establishes that electronic records of retail licensees may be stored off site, provided that such records are readily retrievable and available for electronic inspection by the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (Board) or its special agents at the licensed premises. The bill provides that in the case that such electronic records are not readily available for electronic inspection on the licensed premises, the retail licensee may obtain Board approval, for good cause shown, to permit the licensee to provide the records to a special agent of the Board within three business days or less, as determined by the Board, after a request is made to inspect the records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; records of retail licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1379ER)
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled
2018-03-09SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-03-08HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-02-28SenateSenators: DeSteph, Cosgrove, McPike
2018-02-28SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-02-27HouseDelegates: Robinson, Knight, Jones, J.C.
2018-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-02-27HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-02-26SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-02-26SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N)
2018-02-22HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 97-N)
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-02-20SenateRead third time
2018-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 18104215D-E
2018-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1379E
2018-02-06HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-06HouseRead second time
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-01HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 18104215D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41204(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1379
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1379+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1379E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1379ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0729+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1103V0018+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0079+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0410+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S09V0081+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0560HB1379+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0571HB1379+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0581HB1379+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0582HB1379+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0986+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0683HB1379+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1497+HB1379
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1158HB1379+HB1379

Bill Comments

feedback