VA HB1376 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Wireless Service Authority Act; appointments to board. Provides that a board established under the Virginia Wireless Service Authority Act may contain either five or seven members, rather than five members as required under current law.
Title
Virginia Wireless Service Authority Act; appointments to board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 266 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1376ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Communications |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104652D |
Same As/Similar To
SB953 (Same As) 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)