VA HB1376 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Employment; break to express breast milk. Requires employers, including the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions, to provide reasonable unpaid break time each day to an employee who needs to express breast milk for her nursing child for one year after the child's birth. The bill requires an employer to make reasonable efforts to provide a room or other location in close proximity to the work area, other than a bathroom, where the employee can express breast milk in privacy. An employer shall not be held to have violated these requirements if it has made reasonable efforts to comply with them. The measure applies to employees who are exempt under §7 of the federal Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA). The FLSA requires employers to provide such benefits for nonexempt employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment; break to express breast milk.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 18104107D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.6:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback