VA HB1376 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Claims; Paul R. DesRoches II. Provides relief in the amount of $20,000 to Paul R. DesRoches II from the Virginia Real Estate Transaction Recovery Fund. A real estate firm fraudulently collected rent on behalf of Mr. DesRoches for several months without submitting the funds to him. Mr. DesRoches obtained a judgment against the firm and in 2012 subsequently filed a claim under the Virginia Real Estate Transaction Recovery Act (the Act). At that time, in order to recover under the Act, the judgment had to be based on improper or dishonest conduct. While the factual basis for the judgment detailed conduct included under the definition of "improper or dishonest conduct" contained in the Act, the claim was denied by the Real Estate Board in March 2013 because the words "improper or dishonest conduct" did not appear on the face of the judgment. In 2015, the General Assembly amended the Act to provide a means for the Real Estate Board to determine what constitutes improper or dishonest conduct based on the facts of the case if the judgment order is otherwise silent.
Title
Claims; Paul R. DesRoches II.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 530 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1376ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE(99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104270D |