VA HB1372 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0869)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0869)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Economic Development Partnership; Executive Director; change of title. Changes the title of the Executive Director of the Virginia Economic Development Partnership to the Chief Executive Officer.
Title
Economic Development Partnership; change title for Executive Director.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0869) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 869 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1372ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1372ER) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Printed as engrossed 10104497D-E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1372E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Amendments by Delegate Comstock agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104497D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 985 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 6003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 6203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2233.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2236 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2423 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 221.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |