VA HB1369 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; mandated coverage for autism spectrum disorder. Requires health insurers, health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder in individuals of any age. Currently, such coverage is required to be provided for individuals from age two through age 10. The provision applies with respect to insurance policies, subscription contracts, and health care plans delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended on or after January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; mandated coverage for autism spectrum disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 18101103D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823418.17(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback