VA HB1368 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Group accident and sickness insurance; eligibility for continuation of coverage. Disqualifies a discharged employee from continuation of health insurance coverage under his former employer's group policy if the employee was discharged as a result of gross misconduct. The provision does not apply if the employer is required to provide for continuation of coverage under its group health plan pursuant to the federal Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Group accident and sickness insurance; eligibility for continuation of coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)
2018-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 471 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1368ER)
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-01HouseRead first time
2018-01-30HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 18103836D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823541(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback