VA HB1366 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Home care organization; licensure; multiple locations. Provides that any licensed home care organization may establish one or more branch offices serving portions of the total geographic area served by the licensee, provided that each branch office operates under the supervision and administrative control of the licensee and that the address of each branch office is submitted to the Department of Health and included on any license issued to the licensee. The bill directs the Department of Health to issue an updated license including the address of the newly established branch office to the home care organization within 10 business days of receipt of notice that the home care organization has established the branch office. Currently, a licensed home care organization cannot establish branch offices unless the Commissioner of Health issues a license authorizing the licensee to provide services at one or more branch offices and the address of each branch office is listed on such license.
Title
Home care organization; licensure, multiple locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 105 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1366ER) |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 18104827D-E |
2018-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1366E |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104827D |