VA HB1364 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate settlement agents; emergency. Clarifies that a seller shall not be prohibited from retaining a licensed attorney to represent his interests and provide legal advice pertaining to escrow, closing, or settlement services. This bill is declarative of existing law.
Title
Real estate settlement agents; choice of settlement agent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 669 (effective 4/11/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1364ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22107037D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1364S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107037D-S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107037D-S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22106345D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1364E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 22106345D |
2022-02-09 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Same As/Similar To
SB775 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
SB775 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
SB775 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)