VA HB1361 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Truck Manufacturing Grant Fund; creation. Creates the Truck Manufacturing Grant Fund to make grant payments to an eligible truck manufacturer that makes a capital investment of at least $397 million at a facility in Pulaski County and creates at least 777 new full-time jobs at the facility. The eligible truck manufacturer would be eligible for an aggregate of $16.5 million in grants paid out over a 10-year period if it meets such performance parameters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Truck Manufacturing Grant Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
2020-03-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 265 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSigned by President
2020-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1361ER)
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-31HouseVOTE: Passage (90-Y 9-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (90-Y 9-N)
2020-01-30HousePrinted as engrossed 20102795D-E
2020-01-30HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1361E
2020-01-30HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-30HouseRead second time
2020-01-29HouseRead first time
2020-01-27HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-16HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102795D

Same As/Similar To

SB611 (Same As) 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591284.33(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1361&201+sum+HB1361
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1361+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1361E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1361ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0265+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0001+HB1361
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0005+HB1361
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0014+HB1361
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0248+HB1361
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0342+HB1361
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0734HB1361+HB1361
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0751HB1361+HB1361

Bill Comments

feedback